+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard, Shimabukuro, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ito, McDermott.
- Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 563) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1331) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 864) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi, Wakai.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, JDL.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 122).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 671), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 510) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Carroll, Evans, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Yamane.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-11-13 3:30PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor