+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 607) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor