+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, HTH.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 327).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cheape, Evans, Fukumoto, Ichiyama, Kawakami, Morikawa, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Say voting no (10) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kobayashi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Cheape.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13 at 9:30am.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-22-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 379) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cheape, Fale; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:10PM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, HLT, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor