+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/HRE, WAM.
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 112).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 871), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Alcos.
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 359) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to CMV, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.