+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-12-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 211) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, McDermott.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-06-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor