+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 601) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-15-17 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor