+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 5
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor