+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 416) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in conference room 312.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-13.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.