+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 287).
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 876) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen, Nakamura, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tokioka.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
- Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 535) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Woodson, Ward.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
- The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-21 at 10:30 am.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 3
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor