+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-04-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, WAL, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor