+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 109) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-06-15 8:40AM in House conference room 329.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor