+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor