+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 274).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cachola excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 447) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor