+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 575) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:15PM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor