+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 542) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
- Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor