+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Act 004, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 004, 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 481).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-06-17.
- Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1355) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH/WAM.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1008) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH/WAM.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 317).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to HRE, CPH/WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1055) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Fukumoto.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-02-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-17.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-17 2:01PM in House conference room 329.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Creagan, Har, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:01PM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HED, CPC, referral sheet 5
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor