+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 462) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.