+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSG on Thursday, 02-14-19 11:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.