+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 38) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-03-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor