+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 105).
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 105) as amended in (CD 1).
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Kouchi, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Luke, Kong; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 423.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 423.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 10:00AM in conference room 423.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Luke Co-Chairs; Kong, Ward.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 598) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1486) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-15 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1163) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on EDT will reconsider its previous decision made on 3/18/15 and will hold a public decision making on 03-25-15 2:50PM in conference room 016.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Harimoto.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 101).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to EDT, WAM.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 659), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:45PM in House conference room 308.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 35) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-03-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.