+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 416) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor