+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
- The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-13 3:15PM in conference room 225.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/WTL/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 172).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 514) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Cullen, Hanohano, C. Lee, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Thielen.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13 10:30AM.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-11-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 220) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Coffman; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-13 11:00AM in conference room 325.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-13.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.