+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 449), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, C. Lee, Wooley, McDermott.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 224) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.