+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 024, 03/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1125).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Act 024, on 04/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1125).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 690).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1901) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1323) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 10:45AM in conference room 225.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TRS, JDC.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 442).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 946) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Say, Yamane, Thielen.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-19.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor