+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 94).
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Nakamura, Onishi excused (3).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 806), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor