+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:30PM in conference room 312.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 3:30PM in conference room 312.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Nishihara, Fevella.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814).
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, C. Lee, Todd Co-Chairs; Thielen.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 681) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-05-19.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1855) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1267) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:20PM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 250).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to WTL, JDC.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1146), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 550), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:01PM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 238) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
- Re-referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor