+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 144, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246).
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Act 144, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246).
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 621).
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-21.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 578).
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nakashima Co-Chairs; McDermott.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 495).
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 634) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-21.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1542) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-21 9:50AM; Via Videoconference.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 150).
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka, Ward.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 545), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-18-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor