+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to GVO/WAM.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 262).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 783) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:45PM in House conference room 308.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 487) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-11-15 at 2:30 pm in House conference room 325.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-03-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor