+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 316).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cheape, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Kobayashi, Rhoads, Thielen, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Evans, Fale, Har, McDermott voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 856) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Tokioka, Fukumoto, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor