+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor