+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 10:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 10:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; K. Kahele, Riviere Co-Chairs.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Lowen, McKelvey, Thielen.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 531) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1344) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 1:40PM in conference room 211.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1023) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-17 1:45PM in conference room 224.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 312).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 972) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 48), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-01-17 8:45AM in House conference room 312.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor