+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 310) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Kong, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ito, Matsumoto.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-09-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor