+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, HLT, CPC, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor