+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 24. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto).
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 05-21-20.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3611) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on AEN is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 05-18-20 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN.
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 05-13-20 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received.