+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 25. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 05-03-18.
- Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3847) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on ETT is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 04-30-18 9:00AM in conference room 414.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-13-18 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-18 1:15PM in conference room 414.
- Referred to ETT.
- Received.