+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 23. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, L. Thielen).
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-20-18.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3796) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on HRE is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, S. Chang, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Keith-Agaran.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-18 1:30PM in conference room 224.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HRE.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Received.