+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 25. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-25-17.
- Reported from IAA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1707) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on IAA is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in IAA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Ihara.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on IAA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-17 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to IAA.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT.
- Received.