+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 25. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-17-14.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3447) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on CPN is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-11-14 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received.