+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 21. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, L. Thielen).
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 3-11-16.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2854) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on CPH is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-01-16 9:30AM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Received.