+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 25. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-13-21.
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1618) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on LCA is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA.
- Received.