+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 23. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto).
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-22-18.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3050) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on JDC is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-13-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-18 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
- Received.