+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 24. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English).
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-06-17.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-05-17.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1309) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on JDL is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-17 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Received.