+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 20. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 5 (Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Green, Solomon).
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-14-14.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2872) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on PSM is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-11-14 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-06-14 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM.
- Received.