+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 18. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 7 (Senator(s) S. Chang, Harimoto, Kim, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Tokuda).
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-13-18.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3756) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on CPH is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Ruderman.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-07-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Received.