+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 25. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-25-18.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3831) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on HOU is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Green, K. Kahele, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 04-16-18 1:00PM in conference room 414.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 04-12-18 2:50PM in conference room 225.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-18 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU.
- Received.