+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 24. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard).
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 02-10-20.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2414) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on HWN is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 01-30-20 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-23-20 1:15PM in conference room 016.
- Referred to HWN.
- Received.