+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On February 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass in Senate
- No further action taken
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 19107730D-S2
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Amended by conference committee
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Conference report rejected by House (40-Y 52-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (40-Y 52-N)
- House requested second conference committee
- Second conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Collins, Bell, Robert B., Bourne
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Delegates: Collins, Bell, Robert B., Bourne
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stuart, Chafin, Obenshain
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 29-N)
- Passed House with amendment (70-Y 29-N)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 4-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106056D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1341S1
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19106056D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104282D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (14)
February 23, 2019: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
February 23, 2019: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N)
February 23, 2019: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2019: VOTE: REJECTED (40-Y 52-N)
February 21, 2019: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2019: House amendment rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
February 20, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 29-N)
February 18, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 4-N)
February 11, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
February 4, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
January 23, 2019: Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor