+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (56)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 744 (effective 7/1/15)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB676ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 15105791D-S3
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB676ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (89-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 15105474D-S2
- Amended by conference committee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Delegates: Cox, Jones, Joannou
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Barker, Watkins, Stosch
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
- Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (36-Y 1-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB676H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105005D-H1
- Read third time
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 15105005D-H1
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB676S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104330D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104330D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100217D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
April 15, 2015: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2015: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (36-Y 1-N)
February 17, 2015: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
February 13, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor