+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act 533
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Res By Substitute
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
- House Reconsidered
- House Third Reading Lost
- House Third Readers
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Postponed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Postponed
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper