+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper